Accounts and annual returns THE LUTE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1084704
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 March 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On Time