Financial history THE FUNDING NETWORK

Charity number: 1088315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £725.45k £823.64k £810.96k £888.26k £749.88k
Total expenditure £720.78k £812.69k £764.85k £893.43k £750.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £698.30k £794.42k £788.32k £864.02k £724.30k
Income - Other trading activities £800 £0 £0 £1.99k £0
Income - Charitable activities £26.14k £20.64k £22.62k £21.91k £23.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £214 £185 £19 £340 £2.28k
Income - Other £0 £8.40k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £794.42k £788.32k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £708.04k £806.54k £734.60k £842.71k £718.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.74k £6.15k £30.25k £50.73k £31.57k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.58k £4.95k £6.69k £6.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £631.34k £0 £621.55k £493.93k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0