Financial history MOUNTAIN HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1083219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £104.61k £49.91k £65.53k £37.45k £35.51k
Total expenditure £99.76k £70.62k £51.16k £37.20k £61.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A