Financial history KOLEL BYS SHLOME ARYE TRUST

Charity number: 1091867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £548.41k £450.73k £812.64k £823.19k £881.90k
Total expenditure £475.32k £428.43k £446.51k £795.31k £849.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £548.30k N/A £812.09k £822.39k £854.69k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £107 N/A £544 £803 £27.21k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £854.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £473.71k N/A £373.83k £784.62k £846.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £9.37k £2.16k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.20k N/A £359.34k £784.62k £846.01k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £2.16k
Expenditure - Other £1.61k N/A £72.68k £1.32k £1.44k