S.H.E. UK (SUPPORTING, HEALING, EDUCATING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a range of services for survivors of childhood sexual abuse, exploitation and rape, including support groups, drop-ins, facilitated creative therapy, 1-to-1 therapy & crisis therapy, digital support, personal development courses, & mentoring with 1-1 support. Drop in services are provided in Mansfield, with therapy delivered countywide.We also deliver specialised training and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,461 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 May 2001: Standard registration
- S.H.E. (Working name)
- SHE (SURVIVORS HELPING EACH OTHER) (Previous name)
- SHE (SURVIVORS HELPING EACH OTHER) (Previous name)
- SHE UK (SUPPORTING, HEALING, EDUCATING) (Previous name)
- SURVIVORS HELPING EACH OTHER (S.H.E.) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reena Pastakia | Chair | 15 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Corinna Del Debbio | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Radmila Evanics | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Louise Porter | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LEWIS | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.19k | £249.87k | £162.11k | £198.25k | £215.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.03k | £190.77k | £152.81k | £159.28k | £186.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £75.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.44k | £140.82k | £20.00k | £21.63k | £27.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2014 as amended on 30 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS OF CHILD VICTIMS AND ADULTS SURVIVORS OF INCEST OR CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE, INCLUDING RAPE, THROUGH A RANGE OF SERVICES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO A VARIETY OF THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS, DROP-INS, ADULT LEARNING COURSES AND MENTORING SUPPORT. TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS OF THE FAMILIES OF CHILD VICTIMS AND ADULT SURVIVORS OF INCEST OR CHILDHOOD ABUSE, INCLUDING RAPE, THROUGH A RANGE OF SERVICES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO A VARIETY OF THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS, SUPPORT SESSIONS AND BEFRIENDING SUPPORT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE LONG-TERM PERSONAL AND SOCIAL IMPLICATIONS AND EFFECT OF INCEST AND CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE, THROUGH TRAINING AND CONFERENCE DELIVERY FOR HEALTH, SOCIAL CARE, WELLBEING AND EDUCATION PROVIDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Byron Street
MANSFIELD
NG18 5NX
- Phone:
- 01623 622 916
- Email:
- info@she-uk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window