Financial history Brixton Community Based Ltd

Charity Number: 1082783
Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £91.53k £20.30k £37.99k £53.35k £50.39k
Total expenditure £131.68k £15.25k £29.13k £48.42k £52.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £6.01k £22.81k £8.20k