Financial history YOUNG LIFE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1090515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.82m £2.31m £2.05m £2.81m £2.93m
Total expenditure £1.73m £1.97m £2.39m £2.75m £3.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £131.58k N/A N/A £3.00k £3.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.41m £1.85m £1.57m £2.25m £2.37m
Income - Other trading activities £387.49k £449.35k £375.99k £398.40k £398.29k
Income - Charitable activities £22.72k £16.62k £101.74k £152.13k £153.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.49k £35 £666 £4.81k £8.90k
Income - Other £2.47k £725 £2.99k £671 £2.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.28m £1.47m £1.76m £1.99m £2.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £449.07k £499.70k £629.87k £759.16k £723.96k
Expenditure - Governance £19.42k £19.66k £19.27k £19.27k £28.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0