Financial history South East London Mind Limited

Charity number: 1082972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.27m £4.03m £5.40m £6.83m £7.88m
Total expenditure £3.91m £3.97m £4.78m £6.38m £7.35m
Income from government contracts £2.00m £3.54m £5.11m £6.25m £7.17m
Income from government grants £83.00k £105.43k £91.30k £104.21k £182.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £340.30k £79.80k £98.40k £99.86k £276.66k
Income - Other trading activities £42.90k £37.75k £42.44k £59.10k £74.04k
Income - Charitable activities £3.88m £3.91m £5.26m £6.65m £7.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.11k £3.12k £1.08k £15.28k £53.63k
Income - Other £5.57k £630 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £250.12k £0 £0 £15.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.91m £3.94m £4.76m £6.37m £7.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.65k £21.91k £16.17k £9.99k £22.94k
Expenditure - Governance £40.10k £72.20k £95.39k £113.48k £126.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2 £2.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0