Financial history BELIEVE TO ACHIEVE

Charity number: 1084066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £124.28k £156.89k £188.34k £238.11k £165.08k
Total expenditure £161.42k £148.28k £169.82k £218.75k £186.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.50k N/A N/A