Financial history ST CLEMENT DANES SCHOOL ANCHOR FUND

Charity number: 1084865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.89k £44.09k £64.29k £49.95k £46.99k
Total expenditure £107.32k £54.01k £30.81k £22.78k £32.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A