Accounts and annual returns NORTH WEALD AIRFIELD MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1084618
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 21 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 13 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 12 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required