Financial history NORTH WEALD AIRFIELD MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1084618
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £100 £100 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £78 £75 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0