Financial history SONGBIRD SURVIVAL

Charity number: 1085281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £378.96k £360.56k £460.39k £437.93k £407.56k
Total expenditure £271.29k £266.11k £341.27k £401.82k £538.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A