Trustees ST KYNEBURGHA BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 1084471

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Annabel Dickens | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Grist | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev RAYMOND HEMINGRAY | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Gibson | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Perkins | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETER BOULTON | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM BAXTER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.