THE ACADEMY OF ANCIENT MUSIC

Charity number: 1085485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education of the public through concerts of baroque and early classical music on period instruments.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • Colombia
  • France
  • Germany
  • Netherlands
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Scotland
  • Spain
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ACADEMY OF ANCIENT MUSIC (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL DAVID BAUMANN CBE Chair 28 June 2018
None on record
Huw George Carvil Humphreys Trustee 01 January 2025
Dulwich Prep & Senior
Received: On time
Joseph Gwyn Adams Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Malcolm James Gammie CBE KC Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Catherine Theresa O'Neill Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
JONATHAN ELEY Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Daryl Fielding Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
Jane Victoria Barker Trustee 13 January 2022
QUEEN ALEXANDRA'S HOUSE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ELISE DOMINIQUE BADOY Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.32m £934.14k £756.66k £844.80k £992.00k
Total expenditure £1.38m £1.09m £570.11k £1.04m £1.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £75.46k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £422.85k £384.81k £431.01k £308.91k £314.77k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £891.84k £546.04k £325.34k £526.20k £662.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.87k £3.28k £300 £9.69k £14.56k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £18.49k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.26m £994.24k £480.44k £968.67k £901.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds £120.55k £94.51k £89.68k £74.46k £104.11k
Expenditure - Governance £6.30k £15.36k £6.65k £8.39k £13.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £464.92k £477.74k
Other assets £1.22m £993.69k £1.23m £467.97k £515.87k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £130.95k £56.68k £102.17k £42.75k £112.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cherry Trees Centre
St Matthew's Street
Cambridge
CB1 2LT
Phone:
01223301509