THE COPPICE NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The following activities are held at the centre: 1. Youth Activities 2. Elderly Luncheon Club 3. Advice Work 4. Educational Activities, 5. Training Opportunities, 6. Children's activities (0-5 yrs old)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oldham
Governance
- 20 February 2002: Standard registration
- COPPICE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED AZAM | Chair | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Javed Tariq | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Toor | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
TAQEER AHMED | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Azhar Mahmood | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Waseem Arshad Rashid | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anees Rehman | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nyla Ibrahim | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ali Asghar | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.08k | £53.37k | £72.08k | £88.60k | £62.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.54k | £76.53k | £76.95k | £83.17k | £78.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.25k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1983 AS AMENDED 31 MAY 1998, 17 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 7 JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COPPICE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
COPPICE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
61-63 WERNETH HALL ROAD
OLDHAM
OL8 4BD
- Phone:
- 01616264586
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window