Financial history THE LOYOLA PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1085079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.92m £1.93m £1.96m £1.98m £2.07m
Total expenditure £1.86m £1.88m £1.92m £1.93m £2.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £600 £300
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.74k
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.90m £1.94m £1.97m £2.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.55k £76 £1.05k £12.70k £28.54k
Income - Other £76.99k £27.94k £19.34k £1.66k £5.87k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.86m £1.88m £1.92m £1.93m £2.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0