Financial history LONDON SHAKESPEARE WORKOUT (LSW) PRISON PROJECT

Charity number: 1084717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.79k £9.39k £6.52k £5.75k £8.56k
Total expenditure £5.79k £5.43k £3.30k £3.39k £5.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A