Financial history LONGBOROUGH FESTIVAL OPERA

Charity number: 1087303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.25m £1.69m £2.35m £2.85m £3.56m
Total expenditure £795.81k £2.03m £2.37m £2.50m £3.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.11k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.24m £1.07m £1.32m £1.12m £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £660 £114.06k £161.13k £202.52k £245.30k
Income - Charitable activities £10.54k £503.92k £873.56k £1.07m £1.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £181 £313 £2.64k £13.11k
Income - Other £1.31k £0 £0 £450.04k £615.81k
Income - Legacies £0 £109.00k £12.84k £0 £50.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £795.73k £1.97m £2.30m £2.42m £3.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £59.05k £72.39k £82.46k £80.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £13.09k £37.73k £46.41k £45.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81 £0 £0 £0 £0