DAMILOLA TAYLOR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The current activities of the charity are two fold: in its wider sense it is to campaign to create a community resilience to youth violent crime. More specifically the Charity works to mentor families and young people on how to make a significant transition in thinking and knowledge so that they can lead healthy lives; stay in school; grow up to become productive adults in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southwark
Governance
- 18 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BABATUNDE TAYLOR | Chair | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Vincent Sheath | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
OLUGBENGA COKER | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.27k | £297.87k | £126.88k | £45.34k | £40.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.86k | £186.39k | £89.97k | £140.56k | £54.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £93.44k | £99.98k | £48.00k | £22.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH MAY 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND TO PROVIDE FOR THEM FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION. (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITY CAUSED BY OR ASSOCIATED WITH EPILEPSY PARTICULARLY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN WEST AFRICA. (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WEST AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Barrington Villas Close
London
SE18 3SB
- Phone:
- 07425268359
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window