CITIZENS ADVICE MAIDENHEAD AND WINDSOR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help people resolve legal, money and other problems by providing information, advice, advocacy and representation and by influencing policymakers most frequent issues are the welfare benefit system, relationship and family, employment, housing and consumer problems. Home visiting for disabled and frail.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £35,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £132,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 28 February 2001: Standard registration
- 20 January 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 20 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1065672 CITIZENS ADVICE EAST BERKSHIRE LIMITED
- MAIDENHEAD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.86k | £206.18k | £190.40k | £213.75k | £293.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.68k | £217.80k | £181.38k | £210.48k | £279.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £35.00k | £35.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £132.74k | £132.00k | £132.00k | £135.60k | £132.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 11 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2015 as amended on 21 Jan 2020 as amended on 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window