Financial history GESGB

Charity number: 1085619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £924.97k £440.46k £773.45k £521.33k £669.72k
Total expenditure £1.29m £487.09k £582.64k £443.98k £614.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £11.05k N/A £5.40k £125.85k £34.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £555.98k £225.14k £417.99k
Income - Charitable activities £353.83k N/A £207.34k £167.35k £209.87k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £5.40k £0 £34.35k
Income - Investment £13.37k N/A £4.42k £2.99k £6.92k
Income - Other £546.72k N/A £310 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £774.68k N/A £575.49k £230.02k £251.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £517.39k N/A £7.15k £2.67k £7.38k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £7.15k £0 £7.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £211.29k £355.74k