GESGB

Charity number: 1085619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance, for the public benefit, education in the scientific and technical aspects of subsurface energy and related technologies. This is achieved by variety of means: sponsorships of students studying earth sciences, monthly lectures, conferences and seminars, field trips, member communications, special interest groups, regional branches

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Geoscience Energy Society of Great Britain (Working name)
  • PETROLEUM EXPLORATION SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN (Working name)
  • PESGB (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Robertson Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Jasmine Tran Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Abbie Morrison Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Charlie Watson Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Niall Mark Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Paul Bellingham Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Maria Lake Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Jennifer Scott Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Francesca Twyman Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Stephen Laux Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Ian Leslie Sayers Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Robert Aaron Lockwood Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £924.97k £440.46k £773.45k £521.33k £669.72k
Total expenditure £1.29m £487.09k £582.64k £443.98k £614.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £11.05k N/A £5.40k £125.85k £34.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £555.98k £225.14k £417.99k
Income - Charitable activities £353.83k N/A £207.34k £167.35k £209.87k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £5.40k £0 £34.35k
Income - Investment £13.37k N/A £4.42k £2.99k £6.92k
Income - Other £546.72k N/A £310 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £774.68k N/A £575.49k £230.02k £251.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £517.39k N/A £7.15k £2.67k £7.38k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £7.15k £0 £7.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £211.29k £355.74k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £749.09k N/A £2.90k £724 £0
Long-term investments £0 N/A £477.88k £452.18k £491.63k
Other assets £259.88k N/A £253.72k £334.07k £221.07k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £577.93k N/A £117.93k £118.16k £51.88k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN GEOLOGY OR GEOPHYSICS BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOLARSHIP OR SCHOLARSHIPS IN THE MANNER HEREINAFTER APPEARING
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Registration history
  • 18 February 1998 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
PESGB
Business & Technology Centre
Bessemer Drive
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG1 2DX
Phone:
02074082000