Accounts and annual returns AUDIENCES SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1087000
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 06 June 2013 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 21 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 30 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 30 January 2012 On Time