Financial history AUDIENCES SOUTH WEST

Charity Number: 1087000
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £294.81k £320.83k £207.81k £120.59k £117.75k
Total expenditure £270.99k £272.22k £209.84k £121.68k £122.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A