Financial history TANSOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1084951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.18k £12.72k £7.48k £8.42k £9.08k
Total expenditure £8.61k £6.44k £11.50k £12.62k £9.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A N/A