Financial history THE HALLAMSHIRE AND DISTRICT GUILD OF WEAVERS SPINNERS AND DYERS

Charity number: 1086572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £2.74k £968 £4.02k £2.88k £3.68k
Total expenditure £2.44k £1.21k £3.30k £2.84k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A