Financial history BIRMINGHAM CITY FC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £680.44k £859.85k £1.15m £1.12m £1.30m
Total expenditure £601.08k £676.40k £1.03m £1.18m £1.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.33k £64.15k £7.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £83.30k £45.76k £61.10k £67.14k £206.79k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £560.74k £749.93k £1.08m £1.05m £1.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £75 £18 £5 £85 £232
Income - Other £36.33k £64.15k £7.60k £0 £33.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £601.08k £676.40k £1.03m £1.18m £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £14.31k £11.78k £26.60k £31.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0