Financial history TREAD THE BOARDS THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 1087823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £5.70k £340 £2.91k £3.95k £6.97k
Total expenditure £5.39k £986 £2.95k £4.34k £6.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A