BEIS KOSOV

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity also operates under the name of Hachnosas Orchim Noam Shabbos (London). The object is to the provide Sabbath and Festival meals,promote the advancement of Education and Learning of the Jewish Religion, and the relief of poverty, and assisstance for the aged, vulnerable and infirm, and such other purposes as recognised by English Law as charitable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 11 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Halpert | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD STERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOISHE ROTTENBERG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394.82k | £230.49k | £264.27k | £535.95k | £231.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.85k | £248.28k | £256.72k | £452.71k | £334.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £528.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £188.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £451.55k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 6TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, FEEBLE AND INFIRM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 LEWIS GARDENS
LONDON
N16 5PJ
- Phone:
- 02088096534
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window