HELP NEPAL NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HeNN's objective is to encourage Nepalese and those with an interest in Nepal, around the world to contribute and provide assistance in the field of health, education and emergency relief which will enable the sector to relief the poverty and improve the quality of life for people and their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nepal
Governance
- 17 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SACHIN SHRESTHA | Chair | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
YADAV BHANDARI | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|||||
KULDEEP PRADHAN | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PRATIMA JOSHI | Trustee | 28 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PRADEEP PANERU | Trustee | 28 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PRASHIDHA PRADHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BHAGIRATH YOGI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.15k | £3.55k | £2.26k | £8.14k | £10.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.09k | £18 | £0 | £10.71k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST MARCH 2001 AND AS AMENDED BY 11TH AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUNDS AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN NEPAL, PARTICULARLY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, NEED AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 COXWELL ROAD
LONDON
SE18 1AN
- Phone:
- 07888812312
- Email:
- admin@helpnepal.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window