DR EDWIN DOUBLEDAY FUND FOR PROMOTION OF THE AWARENESS OF NON CLINICAL ASPECTS OF PATIENT CARE IN MEDICAL TRAINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education in health care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 May 2001: Standard registration
- DR EDWIN DOUBLEDAY FUND (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ROBERT ST V L DOUBLEDAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Lionel Bailly | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Turley | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nick Parry-Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN VINCENT DOUBLEDAY | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STORM BACK | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.55k | £5.17k | £12.30k | £2.60k | £7.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.50k | £8.00k | £6.80k | £4.50k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH FEBRUARY 2001, AS AMENDED 19TH MAY 2001
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS; AND IN DOING SO, (A) TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF TREATMENT OF THOSE WHO ARE SUBJECT TO MEDICAL INTERVENTION OR WHO SUFFER ILLNESS OR DISABILITY; AND (B) TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AMONG HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS OF NON-CLINICAL ASPECTS OF MEDICAL INTERVENTION AND THE CARE OF THOSE WITH ILLNESS OR DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOAT LODGE
GOAT LODGE ROAD
GREAT TOTHAM
MALDON
ESSEX
CM9 8BX
- Phone:
- 01621891329
- Email:
- info@doubledayfund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window