YOUTH SPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving the quality of PE & school sport Developing incl. PE & school sport to engage the least active Modernising competitive school sport to offer more young people the opp to compete Enabling & empowering young people to lead & be role models Maximising the experiences of elite athletes via mentor training & deployment Supporting the use of PE to impact on academic progress & acheivement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£10,091,135
Donations and legacies | £267.58k | |
Charitable activities | £8.56m | |
Other trading activities | £907.79k | |
Investments | £356.49k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,953,842
Raising funds | £538.52k | |
Charitable activities | £10.24m | |
Other | £179.80k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £197,779 from 10 government contract(s) and £594,254 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £718.32k | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.24m |
People

112 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
220 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Colin Neil Davidson | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fatou Jeng | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Abhishna Yogarajan | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Francis Gilligan | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Boakes | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shweta Sharma | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Elizabeth Marie Copenhagen | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATHERINE JANE GRAINGER | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paula Catherine Heather Franklin | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Billy Downie | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.58m | £9.51m | £11.99m | £10.33m | £10.09m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.21m | £7.82m | £10.92m | £11.45m | £10.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £422.45k | £46.89k | £17.61k | £25.90k | £197.78k | |
|
Income from government grants | £546.54k | £678.77k | £718.94k | £295.06k | £594.25k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £169.63k | £478.86k | £322.99k | £282.55k | £267.58k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.19m | £867.38k | £972.89k | £863.02k | £907.79k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.16m | £8.13m | £10.66m | £9.03m | £8.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £51.83k | £34.36k | £26.95k | £156.83k | £356.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.63m | £7.48m | £10.54m | £10.83m | £10.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £339.37k | £240.25k | £193.48k | £390.39k | £538.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £106.90k | £96.91k | £89.94k | £91.31k | £119.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £245.45k | £100.05k | £178.90k | £227.17k | £179.80k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £74.83k | £70.58k | £89.09k | £96.85k | £70.41k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £9.48m | £10.95m | £12.13m | £11.61m | £10.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.19m | £959.10k | £1.10m | £1.70m | £1.37m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 2001 as amended on 26 Jun 2018 as amended on 25 Jun 2019 as amended on 17 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects ("Objects") for the public benefit and in particular for the benefit of young people under the age of 25 both in the United Kingdom and internationally ("Young People") are: (1) To support, enable and encourage Young People, irrespective of ability, to participate in sport and physical activity, whether in schools, other educational establishments or the wider community, by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities to help Young People to develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals, advancing their mental and physical health and education. (2) To provide advice and assistance to parents, carers and families to enable and encourage them to support Young People, irrespective of age or ability, to participate in sport and physical activity. (3) To improve and increase the provision of sport and physical activity opportunities available for Young People by building networks, delivering training and seeking co-ordination, collaboration and co-operation amongst providers of sport, physical activity and physical education, and between sport, education and health providers. (4) To promote the benefits of sport and physical activity (in general and in particular) and the physical and mental health of Young People by undertaking and disseminating research into sport, physical activity, the impact of sport on academic achievement and into the physical and mental health of Young People. (5) To seek to influence policy makers at local, national and international levels about the importance of sport and physical activity and its benefits to Young People (without engaging in any party-political activity). (6) To advance such other charitable purposes as the directors may from time to time think fit. Nothing in the articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth Sport Trust
SportPark
3 Oakwood Drive
LOUGHBOROUGH
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE11 3QF
- Phone:
- 01509 462900
- Email:
- info@youthsporttrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window