Financial history THE BATSFORD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1090796
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.75m £1.56m £2.12m £1.84m £2.10m
Total expenditure £1.50m £1.37m £1.60m £1.66m £1.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £66.65k £66.65k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.52k £70.52k £42.57k £3.74k £9.58k
Income - Other trading activities £1.01m £817.70k £1.13m £995.18k £1.15m
Income - Charitable activities £637.71k £610.03k £847.45k £737.95k £804.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £95.53k £64.79k £104.22k £103.01k £140.36k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £485.82k £471.49k £500.51k £581.43k £672.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.01m £901.46k £1.09m £1.08m £1.19m
Expenditure - Governance £26.90k £32.92k £29.90k £43.95k £40.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £6.00k £3.73k
Expenditure - Investment management £43.48k £39.48k £46.80k £83.30k £100.54k
Expenditure - Other £2.51k £0 £4.12k £0 £0