Financial history THE CHARLES PEEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1087249
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £46.16k £66.33k £24.52k £26.51k £28.18k
Total expenditure £47.52k £66.66k £57.69k £52.77k £52.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A