THE HILL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Award of Hill Foundation Scholarships to Russian students to study at Oxford University. Grant making policy in favour of specific one-off events includes: support of educational establishments, cultural exchanges, conferences and promotion of Russian art and culture, with an emphasis on youth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof John Nightingale | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Alastair Tulloch | Trustee | 10 May 2007 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
CATRIONA KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25m | £1.10m | £486.44k | £314.20k | £350.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £896.76k | £1.33m | £2.61m | £2.51m | £2.38m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £564.00k | £564.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £688.47k | £538.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £564.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £819.04k | £1.25m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £77.72k | £82.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.46k | £17.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £765.87k | £1.20m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £77.72k | £79.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLE OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28/03/01 AS AMENDED 29/03/04 as amended on 06 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE NOW OR MAY HEREAFTER BE DEEMED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HILL STREET
LONDON
W1J 5NE
- Phone:
- 02073181180
- Email:
- atulloch@atulloch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window