Trustees FRIEND IN NEED COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1090701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RUPERT LAZAR Chair
EAST BARNET BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Philip Cohen Trustee 30 April 2024
THE VALENTINE POOLE CHARITY
Received: On time
Marie Sauka Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Sharmini Chandrasekar Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Richard Murray Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Keith Nipps Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
Victoria Small Trustee 28 March 2020
None on record