Financial history FLAXLEY SCHOOLROOM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1098472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.31k £11.58k £6.92k £3.82k £6.94k
Total expenditure £2.56k £1.51k £11.66k £6.49k £11.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.60k N/A N/A N/A