Financial history THE LEARNING CURVE VOLUNTARY SECTOR DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1090735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £563.85k £105.57k £67.36k £204.98k £235.66k
Total expenditure £633.17k £73.27k £57.18k £153.45k £157.47k
Income from government contracts £412.24k £45.57k £67.36k £43.25k £72.24k
Income from government grants £119.26k £43.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £31.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £532.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £77 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £633.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A