Governing document THE LEARNING CURVE VOLUNTARY SECTOR DEVELOPMENT
Charity number: 1090735

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.