Governing document VEOLIA PITSEA MARSHES MAINTENANCE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM & ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13/03/2000 AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/05/2007 & 24/08/2010, AND BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 19/10/2001, 31/03/2009 & 30 /09/2009, NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED 03/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2019 as amended on 09 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHIN THE MINIMUM PRESCRIBED TIMETABLE THROUGH THE: 3.1 PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY RESTORING OR RECLAIMING LAND WHICH CAN OTHERWISE BE USED FOR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL PURPOSES BY REASON OF POLLUTION DAMAGE CAUSED BY AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. 3.2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.2.1 PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANY POTENTIAL CAUSES OF POLLUTION IN RELATION TO ANY LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND; AND 3.2.2 REMEDYING OR MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF ANY POLLUTION IN RELATION TO ANY LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. 3.3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.3.1 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES; AND 3.3.2 CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH (IN THIS CLAUSE, "SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES" SHALL MEAN WASTE MINIMISATION, MINIMISATION OF POLLUTION AND HARMFUL WASTE, RE-USE OF WASTE, WASTE RECOVERY ACTIVITIES AND CLEARANCE OF POLLUTANTS FROM CONTAMINATED LAND). 3.4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.4.1 THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND OR OPEN SPACE; OR 3.4.2 THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE PROVIDED THAT ANY PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND, OPEN SPACE OR PUBLIC AMENITY PROVIDED, MAINTAINED, OR IMPROVED BY VIRTUE OF THIS CLAUSE SHALL NOT BE OPERATED FOR PROFIT. 3.5 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF A BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE WHICH: 3.5.1 IS A PLACE OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OR OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST, 3.5.2 IS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, AND 3.5.3 IS SITUATED IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, PROVIDED THAT PARAGRAPH (6) OF THE REGULATION 33 (2) OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 (AS AMENDED) IS COMPLIED WITH. 3.6 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE CONSERVATION OR PROMOTION OF BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY BY: 3.6.1 THE PROVISION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION OR ENHANCEMENT OF A NATURAL HABITAT IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, OR 3.6.2 THE MAINTENANCE OR RECOVERY OF A SPECIES IN ITS NATURAL HABITAT, ON LAND OR IN WATER SITUATED IN THE VICINITY OF AN LANDFILL SITE, PROVIDED THAT PARAGRAPH (3A) OF THE REGULATION 33 (2) OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 (AS AMENDED) IS COMPLIED WITH.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.