OUCH (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity had another successful year. Invaluable support and information to cluster headache sufferers continued to be provided through our Advice Line, website and social media. Patient community forums provided with over 5000 members. Annual Conference held with world-leading speakers and patient forums. Key support and advocacy relationships maintained with related charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 May 2002: Standard registration
- ORGANISATION FOR THE UNDERSTANDING OF CLUSTER HEADACHES (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR PETER JAMES GOADSBY | Chair | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nick Silver | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Nolan | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Hobbs | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Turner Turner | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Chapman | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.16k | £28.48k | £36.57k | £29.44k | £48.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.97k | £22.26k | £11.86k | £15.27k | £30.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 MARCH 2002 AND 13 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
A) RELIEVE THE DISTRESS OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FORM CLUSTER HEADACHES AND THEIR FAMILIES PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY (I) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION FOR SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES (II) LIASING WITH THE MEDICAL PROFESSION TO IMPROVE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT (B) CONDUCT AND SUPPORT RESEARCH IN TO CLUSTER HEADACHES AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
956 High Road
LONDON
N12 9RX
- Phone:
- 01646651979
- Email:
- info@ouchuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window