Trustees OUCH (UK)

Charity number: 1091919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR PETER JAMES GOADSBY Chair 24 June 2015
None on record
Dr Nick Silver Trustee 08 July 2023
None on record
Dale Nolan Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Valerie Hobbs Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
Margaret Anne Turner Turner Trustee 22 June 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Kelly Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Dorothy Chapman Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record
COLIN ALLEN Trustee
None on record