Financial history WHITEHALL ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 1089558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.42k £22.01k £4.69k £11.75k £12.84k
Total expenditure £22.30k £6.87k £5.40k £11.18k £12.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A