Financial history RUDDINGTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1087998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £234.37k £224.08k £337.54k £241.92k £128.00k
Total expenditure £197.77k £206.05k £434.81k £191.87k £179.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.49k £160.89k £9.64k £16.85k