Trustees RUDDINGTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1087998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Rowson Chair 07 November 2016
None on record
Dr Rebekah Ellen Pickering-Wood Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Graham Shuttleworth Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Bryn Smith Trustee 22 September 2017
None on record
PETER FREDERICK MCGOWAN Trustee 26 January 2015
RUDDINGTON LOCAL HISTORY AND AMENITY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE BOOKPLATE SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 551 days