THE ELIZABETH HALL CANCER CARE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of relief, care and treatment for anyone suffering fron cancer or related diseases and for the provisionof financial assistance to those who are in need or are suffering hardship as a result of their own illness or that of a member of their family from cancer or related diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 2001: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 09 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1089464 CANCER RESEARCH UK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £4.56k | £589 | £816 | £220 | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.83k | £51.54k | £9.41k | £35.46k | £17.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 26 February 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 06 February 2019 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH JUNE 2001, AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17TH JULY 2002 AND 2 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL ASPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (1) FOR THE PROVISION OF RELIEF, CARE AND/OR TREATMENT FOR ANYONE SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR RELATED DISEASES AND DISORDERS WHETHER BY DIRECT GRANT TO ANY SUCH SUFFERER OR BY PAYMENT TO ANY EXISTING OR FUTURE FUND, FOUNDATION, HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION, CORPORATE BODY OR TRUST ENGAGED IN SUCH RELIEF, CARE AND/OR TREATMENT. (2) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OR ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP PARTICULARLY AS A RESULT OF THEIR OWN ILLNESS OR THAT OF A MEMBER OF THEIR FAMILY FROM CANCER OR RELATED DISEASES OR DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window