Financial history FOUNDATION OF LIGHT

Charity number: 1089333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.37m £3.78m £4.39m £4.29m £4.91m
Total expenditure £4.24m £4.10m £4.93m £4.77m £5.22m
Income from government contracts £902.78k £1.21m £61.70k £175.58k £267.58k
Income from government grants £240.00k £201.63k £68.42k £116.22k £48.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £812.61k £499.24k £283.83k £98.11k £143.50k
Income - Other trading activities £476.12k £388.02k £1.10m £1.31m £1.60m
Income - Charitable activities £2.71m £2.69m £3.00m £2.85m £3.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £37.27k £48.71k
Income - Other £380.81k £201.63k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.64m £3.56m £3.94m £3.99m £4.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £598.58k £541.01k £809.67k £785.07k £907.69k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £25.05k £21.83k £26.03k £34.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £179.91k £0 £0