Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE ST. JAMES'S CHURCH ELSTEAD, CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1088231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.99k £10.69k £3.73k £2.61k £3.17k
Total expenditure £999 £2.19k £66 £60 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A