Trustees LINKS: THE CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE AND ACTION LIMITED
Charity number: 1089963

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSHRI WELLS | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Habib Kah | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jabalon Martinez-Gill | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joseph William Roberts | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Wright | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Katherine Waldron | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Sansome | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Dung | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.